Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101146164B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B1 | KR20100083849 | 22.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US83944 | 18.11.2008 | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5199381B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2013 | B2 | JP2011504069 | 27.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US83944 | 18.11.2008 | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2215728 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2016 | B1 | EP2215728 | 11.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US83944 | 18.11.2008 | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101911512B | 20.05.2015 | B | CN101911512 | 08.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US83944 | 18.11.2008 | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009067464 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8472890 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2013 | B2 | US2009130994 | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5450771B | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | B2 | JP2013070389 | 18.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200939648 | 16.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US94759707 | 29.11.2007 | US98920307 | 20.11.2007 |