EP2222648 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA, COPD, ALLERGIC RHINITIS, ALLERGIC CONJUNCTIVITIS, ATOPIC DERMATITIS, CANCER, HEPATITIS B, HEPATITIS C, HIV, HPV, BACTERIAL INFECTIONS AND DERMATOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Nicholas, J. AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 02 /
MCINALLY, Thomas AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 03 /
MOCHEL, Tobias AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 04 /
THOM, Stephen AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | 05 /
TIDÉN, Anna-Karin AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
BENNETT, Nicholas, J. AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | ||
02 /
MCINALLY, Thomas AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
03 /
MOCHEL, Tobias AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
04 /
THOM, Stephen AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough, Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | |||
05 /
TIDÉN, Anna-Karin AstraZeneca R&D Charnwood Bakewell Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 5RH / GB | Representative(s) | Curran, Sally Ann, et al AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Curran, Sally Ann, et al AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [2010/38] | Nelson, Michael Andrew, et al AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | Application number, filing date | 08851708.1 | 21.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008SE51334 | Priority number, date | SE20070002577 | 22.11.2007 Original published format: SE 0702577 | US20070013699P | 14.12.2007 Original published format: US 13699 P | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009067081 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222648 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2222648 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/48, A61K31/505, A61P11/00, A61P17/00, A61P27/14, A61P31/00, A61P35/00, C07D239/49, C07D401/10, C07D401/12, C07D403/10, C07D403/12, C07D417/10 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
C07D239/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/505 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D239/49 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Extension states | AL | 22.06.2010 | BA | 22.06.2010 | MK | 22.06.2010 | RS | 22.06.2010 | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA, COPD, ALLERGISCHER RHINITIS, ALLERGISCHER KONJUNKTIVITIS, ATOPISCHER DERMATITIS, KREBS, HEPATITIS B, HEPATITIS C, HIV, HPV, BAKTERIELLEN INFEKTIONEN UND DERMATOSE | [2010/35] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA, COPD, ALLERGIC RHINITIS, ALLERGIC CONJUNCTIVITIS, ATOPIC DERMATITIS, CANCER, HEPATITIS B, HEPATITIS C, HIV, HPV, BACTERIAL INFECTIONS AND DERMATOSIS | [2010/35] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME, DE LA BRONCHO-PNEUMOPATHIE CHRONIQUE OBSTRUCTIVE (COPD), DE LA RHINITE ALLERGIQUE, DE LA CONJONCTIVITE ALLERGIQUE, DE LA DERMATITE ATOPIQUE, DU CANCER, DE L'HÉPATITE B, DE L'HÉPATITE C, DU VIH, DU VPP, DES INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES ET DE LA DERMATOSE | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 15.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005119273 (LIPFORD GRAYSON B [US], et al) [A] 1,17* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2657206 (HITCHINGS GEORGE H, et al); | [A]GB1375162 (STUART, A ET AL); | [A]US4179562 (PONSFORD ROGER J [GB]); | [A]US4912112 (SEYDEL JOACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]US6458798 (FUJITA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004214192 (HASHIDA RYOICHI [JP], et al); | [A] - YOSHIMOTO, M ET AL., "Correlation analysis of Baker's studies on enzyme inhibition. 2. Chymotrypsin, trypsin, thymidine phosphorylase, uridine phosphorylase, thymidylate synthetase, cytosine nucleoside deaminase, dihydrofolate reductase, malate dehydrogenase, glutamate dehydrogenase, lactate dehydrogenase, and glycera...", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1976), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 71 - 98, XP000609047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00223a015 | [A] - FALCO, E.A. ET AL., "2,4-Diaminopyrimidines as antimalarials. I. 5-Aryloxyl and 5-alkoxyl derivatives.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1951), vol. 73, no. 8, pages 3753 - 3758, XP002063219 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01152a058 |