EP2210304 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HIGH TEMPERATURE FUEL CELL AS A BACK-UP POWER SUPPLY WITH REDUCED PERFORMANCE DECAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearedge Power, Inc. 7205 NW Evergreen Parkway, Site 100 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Yang 9619 NW Miller Hill Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
KABIR, Zakiul 7008 Ne Rondler Way Apt. 3238 Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | 03 /
EVANS, Craig 9619 Nw Miller Hill Drive Portland OR 97229 / US | 04 /
QIU, Lin 406-530 Proudfoot Lane London Ontario N6H 7W3 / CA | 05 /
MARICLE, Donald, L. 226 Forest Lane Glastonbury CT 06033 / US | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
SONG, Yang 851 Caden Avenue Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | ||
02 /
KABIR, Zakiul 7008 Ne Rondler Way Apt. 3238 Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | |||
03 /
EVANS, Craig 9619 Nw Miller Hill Drive Portland OR 97229 / US | |||
04 /
QIU, Lin 406-530 Proudfoot Lane London Ontario N6H 7W3 / CA | |||
05 /
MARICLE, Donald, L. 226 Forest Lane Glastonbury CT 06033 / US | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08851840.2 | 17.11.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008US83784 | Priority number, date | US20070986271 | 19.11.2007 Original published format: US 986271 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009067408 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210304 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210304 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
H01M8/04768 (EP,US);
H01M8/04238 (EP,US);
H01M8/04358 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04604 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | H01M8/04, H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER HOCHTEMPERATURBRENNSTOFFZELLE ALS BACKUP-STROMVERSORGUNG MIT REDUZIERTEM LEISTUNGSABFALL | [2010/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A HIGH TEMPERATURE FUEL CELL AS A BACK-UP POWER SUPPLY WITH REDUCED PERFORMANCE DECAY | [2010/30] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UNE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE EN TANT QUE SOURCE DE COURANT DE SECOURS AYANT UNE DÉGÉNÉRESCENCE DE PERFORMANCE RÉDUITE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 09.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2008 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | ES | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | IT | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | IE | 17.11.2013 | LU | 17.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | GB | 18.12.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | DE | 03.06.2014 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.11.2008 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
LU | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 17.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 03.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2005026022 (JOOS NATHANIEL IAN [CA]) [I] 1-6 * figures 4,5 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0023] , [0038] , [0061] - [0063] * [A] 7,13,14; | [A]WO03083976 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,13,14 * page 1, lines 6-33 * * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 31 * * page 4, lines 4-21 * * page 5, lines 4-13 * * page 8, lines 30-34 * | International search | [A]US6179986 (SWETTE LARRY L [US], et al); | [A]US6358639 (OKO URIEL M [US], et al); | [A]US7276305 (FUKUMOTO HISATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5525436 (SAVINELL ROBERT F [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005026022 | WO03083976 |