EP2219892 - AUTOMOBILE WHEEL ANTI-SKID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jakl, Albin U Letenského sadu 1304/18 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOBLOCH, Rafael Junacka 17 169 00 Praha 6 / CZ | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Fischer & Partner Intellectual Property s.r.o. Na Hrobci 5 128 00 Prag 2 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Fischer, Michael Fischer & Partner Intellectual Property s.r.o. Na Hrobci 5 128 00 Prag 2 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 08852261.0 | 06.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008CZ00138 | Priority number, date | CZ20070000773 | 06.11.2007 Original published format: CZ 20070773 | [2010/34] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009065365 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2219892 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219892 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/04 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B60C27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | GLEITSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR RAD | [2010/34] | English: | AUTOMOBILE WHEEL ANTI-SKID DEVICE | [2010/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIDÉRAPAGE POUR AUTOMOBILE | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 09.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HR | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | NO | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | IE | 06.11.2011 | LU | 06.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 06.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | BE | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1363320 (MIALAUD LOUIS) [A] 1-6* page 1 - page 2; figure - *; | [AD]FR2758293 (BOBEDA GILBERT [FR]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6341635 (ROBESON PALMER EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 50 - line 65; figure 7; claim - *; | [A]WO2005072996 (JAKL ALBIN [CZ], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claim - * |