EP2213050 - LOW LATENCY HANDOVER BETWEEN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS USING DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless One Verizon Way Basking Ridge, NJ 07920-1097 / US | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTECHA, Lalit, Ratilal 34529 Mahogany Lane Union City CA 94587 / US | 02 /
YANG, Jin 116 Castle Rock Lane Walnut Creek CA 94598 / US | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08852929.2 | 19.11.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008US84001 | Priority number, date | US20070984462 | 19.11.2007 Original published format: US 984462 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009067494 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213050 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H04W36/0033 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04W36/1443 (EP,US);
H04W36/0016 (EP,US);
H04W92/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | ÜBERGABE MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZZEIT ZWISCHEN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN ANHAND VERSCHIEDENER FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN | [2010/31] | English: | LOW LATENCY HANDOVER BETWEEN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORKS USING DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES | [2010/31] | French: | TRANSFERT DE FAIBLE LATENCE ENTRE DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL À L'AIDE DE DIFFÉRENTES TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 12.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004033805 (VERMA SHAILY [US], et al); | [X]WO2005008964 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]US2006126565 (SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US]) | International search | [A]US2006146803 (BAE EUN-HUI [KR], et al); | [X]US2006246903 (KONG DONG-KEON [KR], et al); | [A]US2006245408 (LEE SANG-DO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2007115899 (OVADIA SHLOMO [US], et al) |