EP2212377 - FLAMEPROOF EXPANDABLE STYRENE POLYMERS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLMENDINGER, Markus In den Semmeläckern 17 67480 Edenkoben / DE | 02 /
SCHMIED, Bernhard Willichstr.3 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
RUCH, Joachim In den Backhauswiesen 9 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 04 /
KNOLL, Konrad Tannhäuserring 71 68199 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
RIETHUES, Michael Pielachtalstr.20 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
HAHN, Klaus Im Bügen 9 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 07 /
SCHIPS, Carsten Am Rosssprung 17 67342 Speyer / DE | 08 /
RYLANDER, Jessica Bigatan 1 C 69136 Karlskoga / SE | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
ALLMENDINGER, Markus In den Semmeläckern 17 67480 Edenkoben / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMIED, Bernhard Willichstr.3 67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
03 /
RUCH, Joachim In den Backhauswiesen 9 67157 Wachenheim / DE | |||
04 /
KNOLL, Konrad Tannhäuserring 71 68199 Mannheim / DE | |||
05 /
RIETHUES, Michael Pielachtalstr.20 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
06 /
HAHN, Klaus Im Bügen 9 67281 Kirchheim / DE | |||
07 /
SCHIPS, Carsten Am Rosssprung 17 67342 Speyer / DE | |||
08 /
RYLANDER, Jessica Bigatan 3 D S-691 3 Karlskoga / SE | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 08853011.8 | 20.11.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008EP65879 | Priority number, date | EP20070121211 | 21.11.2007 Original published format: EP 07121211 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009065880 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2212377 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2212377 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08L25/04 (KR);
C08J9/0019 (EP,US);
C08J9/0023 (EP,US);
C08J9/06 (KR);
C08J9/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/10 (KR);
C08K5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0066, C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/02, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/14, C08L25/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE EXPANDIERBARE STYROLPOLYMERE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2010/31] | English: | FLAMEPROOF EXPANDABLE STYRENE POLYMERS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2010/31] | French: | POLYMÈRES STYRÉNIQUES EXPANSIBLES IGNIFUGÉS ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2012
16.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE Opponent's representative Pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2012
16.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE Opponent's representative Pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2012/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.2012
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | 18.12.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.04.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.10.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/51] | Appeal following opposition | 20.06.2014 | Appeal received No. T1384/14 | 20.06.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.10.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 11.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2008 | CY | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | IE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | GB | 20.11.2012 | LU | 20.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
LU | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1164158 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * page 3, lines 24-30; examples D1,D2; table D2 *; | [Y]EP1408073 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0009] *; | [DY]WO2006007995 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-7 * page 1, lines 5-8; example 1 * * page 6, lines 11-35 *; | [DA]WO2006007996 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DA] 5* abstract * |