EP2257884 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING INFORMATION ON A NEIGHBORHOOD AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trilliant Networks, Inc. 1300 Island Drive, Suite 103 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEILLETTE, Michel 109 des Flandres Waterloo, Québec J0E 2N0 / CA | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Grubert, Andreas King & Spalding International LLP 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [2010/49] | Application number, filing date | 08853052.2 | 21.11.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008US13030 | Priority number, date | US20070989957P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989957 P | US20070989967P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989967 P | US20070989958P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989958 P | US20070989964P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989964 P | US20070989950P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989950 P | US20070989953P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989953 P | US20070989975P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989975 P | US20070989959P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989959 P | US20070989961P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989961 P | US20070989962P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989962 P | US20070989951P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989951 P | US20070989955P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989955 P | US20070989952P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989952 P | US20070989954P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989954 P | US20070989971P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989971 P | US20070989966P | 25.11.2007 Original published format: US 989966 P | US20070992315P | 04.12.2007 Original published format: US 992315 P | US20070992312P | 04.12.2007 Original published format: US 992312 P | US20070992313P | 04.12.2007 Original published format: US 992313 P | US20080025276P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25276 P | US20080025282P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25282 P | US20080025271P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25271 P | US20080025287P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25287 P | US20080025278P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25278 P | US20080025273P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25273 P | US20080025277P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25277 P | US20080025279P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25279 P | US20080025270P | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 25270 P | US20080050538P | 05.05.2008 Original published format: US 50538 P | US20080094116P | 04.09.2008 Original published format: US 94116 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009067261 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257884 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/24, H04L12/56, G08C19/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L12/2825 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | AL | 01.10.2010 | BA | 01.10.2010 | MK | 01.10.2010 | RS | 01.10.2010 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER EIN NACHBARSCHAFTSBEREICHSNETZ | [2010/49] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING INFORMATION ON A NEIGHBORHOOD AREA NETWORK | [2010/49] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉMETTRE ET RECEVOIR DES INFORMATIONS CONCERNANT UN RÉSEAU ZONAL DE VOISINAGE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2010 | Decision despatched | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, NO | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003033394 (STINE JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0219] *; | [A]WO03015452 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2005251403 (SHUEY KENNETH C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US2005270173 (BOAZ JON A [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0067]; figures 2,6,8; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO2007132473 (TANLA SOLUTIONS LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041]; claim 12 *; | [XP]US2008068217 (VAN WYK HARTMAN [FR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - YOUNIS M ET AL, "Energy-aware routing in cluster-based sensor networks", MODELING, ANALYSIS AND SIMULATION OF COMPUTER AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS S YSTEMS, 2002. MASCOTS 2002. PROCEEDINGS. 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPO SIUM ON 11-16 OCT. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021011), ISBN 978-0-7695-1840-4, pages 129 - 136, XP010624424 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007109121 (COHEN MARC H [US]); | [X]US2007248047 (SHORTY PETER [DK], et al) |