EP2215447 - METHODS FOR DETECTING DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D METABOLITES BY MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Diagnostics Investments Incorporated 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMQUIST, Brett 21858 Bahamas Mission Viejo California 92692 / US | 02 /
CLARKE, Nigel J. 1689 Avenida Guillermo Oceanside California 92056 / US | 03 /
CASTON-BALDERRAMA, Anne 1477 Le Grande Terrace San Pedro California 90732 / US | 04 /
REITZ, Richard E. 3710 Calle Fino Calrete San Clemente California 92673 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
HOLMQUIST, Brett 21858 Bahamas Mission Viejo California 92692 / US | ||
02 /
CLARKE, Nigel J. 862 Masters Drive Oceanside California 92057 / US | |||
03 /
CASTON-BALDERRAMA, Anne 1477 Le Grande Terrace San Pedro California 90732 / US | |||
04 /
REITZ, Richard E. 3710 Calle Fino Calrete San Clemente California 92673 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Viering, Hans-Martin Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Dokter, Eric-Michael Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08853843.4 | 25.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US84709 | Priority number, date | US20070946765 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: US 946765 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009070594 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215447 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215447 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/82 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/82 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/20 (EP,US);
Y10T436/203332 (EP,US);
Y10T436/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | G01N1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2010/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON DIHYDROXYVITAMIN-D-METABOLITEN MITTELS MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | [2010/32] | English: | METHODS FOR DETECTING DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D METABOLITES BY MASS SPECTROMETRY | [2010/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE MÉTABOLITES DE DIHYDROXYVITAMINE D PAR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 18.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.03.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18211011.4 / EP3524958 | EP24188582.1 / EP4421490 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2008 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.11.2008 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9618618 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [Y]US7087395 (GARRITY MARTHA [US], et al); | [Y]US2006228808 (CLARKE NIGEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2006228809 (CLARKE NIGEL [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007039193 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al); | by applicant | US5772874 | US5795469 | US5919368 | US5968367 | US6107623 | US6124137 | US6204500 | US6268144 |