EP2227627 - ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKAWA, Atsushi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08854129.7 | 25.11.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008IB03219 | Priority number, date | JP20070305980 | 27.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007305980 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068963 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2227627 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2227627 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/22, F02D41/40, F02M65/00 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1002 (EP,US);
F02D41/008 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN und VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON ABNORMALITÄTEN einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2011/05] | English: | ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2010/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ et DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ANOMALIE POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2011/05] |
Former [2010/37] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON ABNORMALITÄTEN FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | ||
Former [2010/37] | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ANOMALIE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | BE | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | HR | 20.07.2011 | HU | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | LV | 20.07.2011 | MT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | NO | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | IE | 25.11.2011 | LU | 25.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH05187300 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [DA] 1,9* abstract *; | [A]EP0785358 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 53 *; | [A]EP0810364 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 46 - line 59 *; | [A]EP0982485 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] *; | [PXA]US2008147299 (HARAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP]) [PX] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * [PA] 3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15 |