EP2670932 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Höseler Platz 2 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLZ, Michael Elbestrasse 9 45136 Essen / DE | 02 /
SCHIFFER, Holger Breslauer Strasse 20 40668 Meerbusch / DE | 03 /
ARMBRUSTER, Stefan Hauptstrasse 136 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 04 /
HERRMANN, Michael Benschenweg 39 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | [2013/50] | Application number, filing date | 08854394.7 | 26.11.2008 | WO2008DE01976 | Priority number, date | DE20072016719U | 28.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016719 U | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009068017 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2670932 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670932 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2670932 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B81/20 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
E05B81/20 (EP);
E05B81/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | E02D/ | ||
Former IPC [2013/50] | E05B65/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜRVERSCHLUSS | [2013/50] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK | [2013/50] | French: | SERRURE DE PORTE DE VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 05.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2008 | CY | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | GB | 26.11.2014 | IE | 26.11.2014 | LU | 26.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.11.2008 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
GB | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
GB | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
GB | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
GB | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003080569 (RAYMOND RAJA [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 30; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE10243893 (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 22; figures 1-2a *; | [A]US5083397 (KOURA SOUSHICHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004052599 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1319780 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]; BOEDDECKER & CO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE202004001850U (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |