EP2215686 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD, PARTICULARLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSHIELD ANTENNA FOR INFLUENCING THE DIRECTIONAL EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt Antenna Systems GmbH & Co. KG Römerring 1 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states ED Enterprises AG Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEHNE, Rainer Hagedornweg 19d 30559 Hannover / DE | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08854800.3 | 10.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP63601 | Priority number, date | DE20071056911 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007056911 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068357 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215686 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01Q1/32, H04B7/08 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1278 (EP,US);
H01Q1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUG-SCHEIBENANTENNE ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG DER RICHTWIRKUNG | [2010/32] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD, PARTICULARLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSHIELD ANTENNA FOR INFLUENCING THE DIRECTIONAL EFFECT | [2010/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE ANTENNE POUR VITRE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE, EN VUE D'AGIR SUR LA DIRECTIVITÉ | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP1076375 (FUBA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * page 8, line 16 - line 26 * * figures 13,14 * * abstract *; | [Y]US6163303 (NAGY LOUIS LEONARD [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 50 * * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO8707770 (KOLBE & CO HANS [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 5, line 25 - page 12, line 18 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A]WO03077362 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 3 - page 11, line 21 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [A]JPH10145122 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * abstract * |