Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2222309 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP08855084 JP2010536204 US2008085056W US201113280148 US201313832869 US32490708



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8916527Global Dossier 23.12.2014B2
US2013252912 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113280148 24.10.2011
US32490708 28.11.2008
US99660907 27.11.2007
US201313832869 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8445654Global Dossier 21.05.2013B2
US2012040922 16.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
US32490708 28.11.2008
US201113280148 24.10.2011
US99660907 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8044030Global Dossier 25.10.2011B2
US2010035833 11.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
US32490708 28.11.2008
US99660907 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5843344BGlobal Dossier 13.01.2016B2
JP2011504938 17.02.2011A
Priority number Date
US99660907 27.11.2007
WO2008US85056 28.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2222309Global Dossier 28.10.2015B1
EP2222309 01.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
US99660907 27.11.2007
WO2008US85056 28.11.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2554364T 18.12.2015T3
Priority number Date
US99660907 27.11.2007
WO2008US85056 28.11.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009070779Global Dossier 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US99660907 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI523654B 01.03.2016B
TW200932250 01.08.2009A
Priority number Date
US99660907 27.11.2007