Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2215895
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.12.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.01.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.07.2013 |
First examination report |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
08.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
09.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
03.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|