EP2215895 - HIGH-FREQUENCY LAMP AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dritte Patentportfolio Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Berliner Strasse 1 12529 Schönefeld/OT Waltersdorf / DE | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUERMANN, Holger Fachhochschule Aachen Eupener Strasse 70 52066 Aachen / DE | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08855170.0 | 27.11.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP66352 | Priority number, date | DE20071057581 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007057581 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009068618 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215895 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/24, H01J65/04 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H05B41/24 (EP,US);
H01J65/042 (EP,US);
H05B41/382 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZLAMPE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2010/32] | English: | HIGH-FREQUENCY LAMP AND METHOD FOR THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2010/32] | French: | LAMPE HAUTE FRÉQUENCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 09.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007126899 (TOPANGA TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * paragraph [0106]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0116]; figure 17 * * paragraph [0108]; figure 9 * [I] 4,7,12,13; | [XI]US5339008 (LAPATOVICH WALTER P [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9,11 * column 3, line 63 - column 8, line 35; figures 1-5 * [I] 4,7,12,13; | [XI]US2007103645 (TAKEUCHI KESATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0177] - [0251]; figures 9-11 * [I] 4,7,12,13; | [X]EP1298707 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0021]; figures 1-11 *; | [XP]WO2008048978 (LUXIM CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,9,10 * page 9, line 11 - page 23, line 8; figures 1A,4,5A *; | [XP]WO2008048972 (LUXIM CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,9,10 * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 18; figures 1A, 2A * * page 13, lines 21-28 * * page 15, line 18 - page 19, line 6 * * page 21, line 3 - page 22, line 24 *; | [X]US6313587 (MACLENNAN DONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 89, line 35 - column 90, line 58; figure 266 * * column 102, line 41 - column 113, line 41; figures 328-351 *; | [A]EP0377442 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [A] 15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5019750 (GODYAK VALERY A [US]) [A] 15,16 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0721203 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, lines 3-47; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004108803 (SCHOLL ROBERT PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023]; figure 2 * | Examination | EP0593311 | US5300860 |