EP2222244 - DIGITALLY-PAINTED DENTAL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 07.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARIM, Naimul 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MITRA, Sumita, B. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08855176.7 | 20.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008US84138 | Priority number, date | US20070990680P | 28.11.2007 Original published format: US 990680 P | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009070482 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222244 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/08, A61C13/00, B41J3/407, B29C67/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
A61C13/0019 (EP,US);
A61C13/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | DIGITAL BEMALTE DENTALARTIKEL | [2010/35] | English: | DIGITALLY-PAINTED DENTAL ARTICLES | [2010/35] | French: | ARTICLES DENTAIRES PEINTS NUMÉRIQUEMENT | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/28] | 06.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2019 | 15.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 06.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006008777 (PETERSON DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0084] * * claims 1,5-14,19 *; | [X]US7086863 (VAN DER ZEL JOSEPH MARIA [NL]) [X] 1-7,13-18,20,21,25 * column 9, line 41 - line 62 * * EXAMPLE 2 * * claims 5-7,10,13,14 * | Examination | US4585417 | US2006240177 | CN1451367 | WO2007083372 | WO2006036114 | US5993214 |