EP2229434 - DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifescan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2010/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZANIA, Alireza 5 Dewitt Lane Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2010/38] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08855258.3 | 25.11.2008 | [2010/38] | WO2008US84705 | Priority number, date | US20070990529P | 27.11.2007 Original published format: US 990529 P | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009070592 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2229434 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2229434 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
C12N5/0678 (US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
C12N2501/105 (EP,US);
C12N2501/117 (EP,US);
C12N2501/12 (EP,US);
C12N2501/15 (US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,US);
C12N2501/335 (EP,US);
C12N2501/385 (EP,US);
C12N2501/40 (US);
C12N2501/41 (EP,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,US);
C12N2501/42 (EP,US);
C12N2501/70 (EP,US);
C12N2501/727 (US);
C12N2501/998 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/38] | C12N5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERUNG MENSCHLICHER EMBRYONALER STAMMZELLEN | [2010/38] | English: | DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS | [2010/38] | French: | DIFFÉRENTIATION DES CELLULES SOUCHES EMBRYONNAIRES HUMAINES | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 20.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | HU | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | IE | 25.11.2011 | LU | 25.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
LU | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 25.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003138948 (FISK GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-102 * paragraph [0067]; table 1 *; | [X]WO2005116073 (NOVOCELL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-102 * figure 1; claims 29-67 *; | [A]WO2006016999 (NOVOCELL INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [XD] - SKOUDY A ET AL, "Transforming growth factor (TGF)beta, fibroblast growth factor (FGF) and retinoid signalling pathways promote pancreatic exocrine gene expression in mouse embryonic stem cells", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, (20040501), vol. 379, no. Pt 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 749 - 756, XP002365298 [XD] 1-102 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20031784 | [A] - KUBO A ET AL, "Development of definitive endoderm from embryonic stem cells in culture", DEVELOPMENT, COMPANY OF BIOLOGISTS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20040401), vol. 131, no. 7, ISSN 0950-1991, pages 1651 - 1662, XP002985523 [A] 1 * page 1652, column RHC, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.01044 | [DA] - MICALLEF S J ET AL, "Retinoic acid induces Pdx1-positive endoderm in differentiating mouse embryonic stem cells", DIABETES, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US, (20050201), vol. 54, no. 2, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 301 - 305, XP002364807 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.54.2.301 | [XD] - D'AMOUR K A ET AL, "Production of pancreatic hormone-expressing endocrine cells from human embryonic stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20060101), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1392 - 1401, XP002423119 [XD] 1-51 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1259 |