EP2218754 - POLYIMIDE COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND FILM OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUKAWA, Kenichi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
SAKATA, Yoshihiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
FUJIO, Ichiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Wataru c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2018/25] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
FUKUKAWA, Kenichi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKATA, Yoshihiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJIO, Ichiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMASHITA, Wataru c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/25] |
Former [2010/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08855621.2 | 27.11.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008JP71524 | Priority number, date | JP20070311130 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007311130 | JP20080161916 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161916 | JP20080161917 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161917 | JP20080161918 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161918 | JP20080161919 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161919 | JP20080161920 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161920 | [2010/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009069688 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218754 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218754 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/08, B32B15/08, C08G73/10, C08J5/18, C09D179/08 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
C08G73/1075 (EP,US);
C08G73/1007 (EP,US);
C08G73/1039 (EP,US);
C08G73/1082 (EP,US);
C09D179/08 (EP,US);
C08K2003/2206 (US);
C08K2003/2224 (US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08L79/08 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYIMIDVERBUNDWERKSTOFF UND FOLIE DARAUS | [2010/33] | English: | POLYIMIDE COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND FILM OF THE SAME | [2010/33] | French: | MATIÈRE COMPOSITE DE POLYIMIDE ET SON FILM | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2010 | Translation filed | 15.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 03.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2008 | AT | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | PT | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | IE | 27.11.2018 | LU | 27.11.2018 | MT | 27.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.11.2008 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
MT | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PT | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
MT | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
MT | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
MT | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.11.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4528303 (SEGAUD CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - line 3 ** column 4, line 5 - line 12; claims 1, 9, 11, 16 *; | [XI]JP2003192891 (THINFLEX CORP) [X] 1,4-14,16,19-25 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 26] , [0 28]; example 1 * [I] 15,17,18; | [X]JP2006282682 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,4,6,9-15,19,20 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 47]; example 1; claims 1-6 * | International search | [X]JPS3716844B (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & CO.); | [X]JPS4313387B (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [X]JPH0649360 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH0649361 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2002030216 (TORAY ENG CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2003105084 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JP2003192891 (THINFLEX CORP); | [A]JP2006282682 (UBE INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPS6268817 | US4965337 | JPH0347837 | JPH0368629 | JPH05178991 | JPH05255501 | JPH05320339 | JPH06207015 | WO0210253 | JP2003212995 | JP2003212996 | JP2005015629 | JP2006291003 |