EP2225198 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING A SUBSTITUTED GAMMA-AMINO ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorio Chimico Internazionale S.p.A. Via Tommaso Salvini 10 20122 Milano / IT | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Medichem, S.A. Fructuós Gelabert 6-8 Sant Joan Despi 08970 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGION, Bernardino 17 Zinnia Street SLC 1151 Santa Lucia / MT | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Federica, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Trupiano, Federica, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/36] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 08855671.7 | 25.11.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008IB03232 | Priority number, date | US20070004982 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: US 4982 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068967 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225198 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2225198 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/04, C07C229/08 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C07C227/04 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/04, C07C229/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | C07C227/04, C07C229/08, A61K31/195, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SUBSTITUIERTEN GAMMA-AMINOSÄURE | [2010/36] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING A SUBSTITUTED GAMMA-AMINO ACID | [2010/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ACIDE AMINÉ À SUBSTITUTION GAMMA | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 21.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | LU | 25.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | NO | 07.02.2013 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/09] | EE | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
NO | 07.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
NO | 07.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9638405 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 14-19 * page 9, lines 28-33 * * page 15, line 20 * * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 26 *; | [DX]WO2006122255 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [DX] 14-19 * examples 1-11 ** paragraph [0048] *; | [DX] - HOEKSTRA MARVIN S ET AL, "0815ical Development of CI-1008, an Enantiomerically Pure Anticonvulsa", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19970101), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 26 - 38, XP002417844 [DX] 14-19 * page 31, column 2, line 16 * * page 26, column 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * |