EP2286147 - ELECTRONIC TILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramaioli, Francesco Via Vignazza, 11D 27100 Pavia / IT | For all designated states Magai, Sabrina Via Borgonuovo, 19 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | For all designated states Cicchelero, Daniela Cascina Giuliana 27020 Dorno (PV) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states RAMAIOLI, Francesco Via Vignazza, 11D 27100 Pavia / IT | ||
For all designated states Magai, Sabrina Via Borgonuovo, 19 27026 Garlasco (PV) / IT | |||
For all designated states Cicchelero, Daniela Cascina Giuliana 27020 Dorno (PV) / IT | |||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states RAMAIOLI, Francesco Via Vignazza, 11D 27100 Pavia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Faggioni, Carlo Maria Fumero S.r.l. Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Faggioni, Carlo Maria Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08855696.4 | 25.11.2008 | [2011/08] | WO2008IB54946 | Priority number, date | IT2007PV00020 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: IT PV20070020 | [2011/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009069076 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286147 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, E04B9/32, E04F15/02, G09F19/00, F21Y101/02 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
F21V33/006 (EP,US);
E04B9/32 (EP);
G09F19/22 (EP,US);
G09F9/3026 (EP);
G09F9/33 (EP);
G09F9/335 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE PLATTE | [2011/08] | English: | ELECTRONIC TILE | [2011/08] | French: | MOSAÏQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | Translation filed | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2013 | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 26.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 19.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2011 | 30.11.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2012 | 30.11.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004022058 (BIRRELL PETER CHARLES [AU]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004100796 (WARD MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005116667 (MUELLER GEORGE G [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US7108392 (STRIP DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007112935 (INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XP]GB2442977 (PHILLIPS CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [XP] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2008134019 (TESSERAE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-18 * the whole document * |