EP2288312 - SPACER MOLDS AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc. 200 West Ohio Avenue Dover, OH 44622 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANEY, Sean 2474 Vixen Street NW North Canton Ohio 44720 / US | 02 /
SPORER, Scott, M. 1040 Golf Lane Wheaton Illinois 60189 / US | 03 /
HAWKINS, Michael, E. 2350 West 350 S Columbia City Indiana 46725 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
HANEY, Sean 2474 Vixen Street NW North Canton Ohio 44720 / US | ||
02 /
SPORER, Scott, M. 1616 Emerson Court Wheaton Illinois 60187 / US | |||
03 /
HAWKINS, Michael, E. 2350 West 350 S Columbia City Indiana 46725 / US | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08855746.7 | 04.12.2008 | [2011/09] | WO2008US85527 | Priority number, date | US20070012082P | 07.12.2007 Original published format: US 12082 P | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009073781 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2288312 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2288312 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/36 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
B29C33/308 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3055 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30672 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30693 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30975 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0007 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00353 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00952 (EP,US);
B29C33/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GUSSFORM FÜR TEMPORÄREN HÜFTGELENKERSATZ UND METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEMPORÄREN HÜFTGELENKERSATZES | [2016/14] | English: | SPACER MOLDS AND METHODS THEREFOR | [2011/09] | French: | MOULES D'ENTRETOISE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/09] | ABSTANDSELEMENTFORMEN UND METHODEN DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 24.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2011 | Decision despatched | 24.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 24.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2008 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | IE | 04.12.2016 | LU | 04.12.2016 | MT | 04.12.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.12.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.12.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.12.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.12.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.12.2016 | ||
LU | 04.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007222114 (ZIRAN BRUCE H [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1a,1b,2a,2b,3a-3c,4a,4b,5a,5b,6a-6c,7a,7b,8a-8c * * figures 9a-9c,10a-10c,11a-11c,12a,12b ** paragraphs [0091] , [0093] - [0097] * |