Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
16.04.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.11.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.10.2011 | First examination report | |
25.10.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.02.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
18.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.07.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
09.07.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
02.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.05.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.07.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.06.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |