|
25.06.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Rule 23 - Annex B |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Document concerning micro-organisms |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.09.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
94 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
11.06.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
11.06.2009 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
68 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Sequence listing |
PCT receiving Office |
19 |