28.06.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.11.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
26.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2012 |
Change - licence |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
03.02.2012 |
Licence |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
19.04.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.02.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2010 |
First examination report |
|
22.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.08.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
09.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
09.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
30.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|