EP2240028 - Pyrazolopyrimidine-4,6-dione derivatives and their use as pharmaceutical [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/42] | ORGANIC COMPOUNDS | ||
[2016/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, Suite 900 New York, NY 10016 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Peng 3960 Broadway New York NY 10032 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Jun 3960 Broadway New York NY 10032 / US | 03 /
ZHENG, Hailin 3960 Broadway New York NY 10032 / US | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | McNab, Donald C., et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/42] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08856780.5 | 06.12.2008 | [2010/42] | WO2008US13410 | Priority number, date | US20070012045 | 06.12.2007 Original published format: US 12045 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009073210 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240028 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240028 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P25/16, A61P25/18, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P9/04, A61P15/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (KR);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | A01N43/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pyrazolopyrimidine-4,6-dione derivate und deren Anwendung als Pharmaceutika | [2016/08] | English: | Pyrazolopyrimidine-4,6-dione derivatives and their use as pharmaceutical | [2016/08] | French: | Dérivés de Pyrazolopyrimidine-4,6-dione et leur utilisation pharmaceutique | [2016/08] |
Former [2010/42] | ORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2010/42] | ORGANIC COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2010/42] | COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 10.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2008 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 06.12.2016 | LU | 06.12.2016 | MT | 06.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.12.2008 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.12.2008 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.12.2016 | ||
LU | 06.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0166054 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]EP0237289 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]WO9846606 (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim - *; | [A]US6133273 (GILBERT ADAM MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example D *; | [A]WO03002567 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [AP]WO2007143705 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9846606 (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al); | [Y]US6133273 (GILBERT ADAM MATTHEW [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006133261 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) | by applicant | - MANI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, page 1053 |