EP2218008 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED MEMORY USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHAR, Muralidhar K. 248 1st Cross 2nd Phase Banashankari 3rd Stage Bangalore 560085 / IN | 02 /
KANNAN, Rajeswari Flat 105 Govindam Apartments Marathahalli Bangalore Karnataka Bangalore 560037 / IN | 03 /
SHYAMASUNDAR, Sushma 89, 4th Main 1st Cross, 1st Block Banashankari 3rd Stage Bangalore 560085 / IN | 04 /
KINI, Prashantha 3rd Floor 2A Jupiter Block Prestige Tech Park Marthahalli Sarjapura Ring Road Kaadabeesanahalli Bangalore Karnataka Bangalore 560087 / IN | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02160 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation IPR Department Keilalahdentie 4 01250 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 08857388.6 | 03.11.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008IB54570 | Priority number, date | INDE25292007 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: IN DE25292007 | US20080047929 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: US 47929 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009072018 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218008 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F12/08, G06F5/10, G06F12/12 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
G06F12/023 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (EP,US);
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
G06F5/10 (EP,US);
G06F2205/126 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR VERBESSERTE SPEICHERNUTZUNG | [2010/33] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED MEMORY USAGE | [2010/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE PERMETTANT UNE MEILLEURE UTILISATION D'UNE MÉMOIRE | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 31.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5502833 (BYRN JONATHAN W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,17,18,25 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - line 50 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 5 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 23; figure 3 * [Y] 3,4,6-8,11,12,14-16,19,20,22-24; | [Y]US5950205 (AVIANI JR JAMES A [US]) [Y] 3,7,8,11,15,16,19,23,24 * abstract *; | [YA]US6553468 (SMITH GORDON JAMES [US]) [Y] 4,6,12,14,20,22 * column 3, line 28 - line 34 * * column 6, line 20 - line 46 * [A] 1,3,9,11,17,19,25; | [X]US2003037210 (HAYWOOD CHRIS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13,17,18,21,25 * paragraph [0022]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]WO2004010306 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 6 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 8 * * page 8, line 11 - line 25 * |