EP2222833 - INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTION OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS USING RECOMBINANT ORGANISMS EXPRESSING METHYL HALIDE TRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Santi, Daniel V. 211 Belgrave Avenue San Francisco, California 94117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California University Of CA Office Of The President 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states Santi, Daniel V. 211 Belgrave Avenue San Francisco, California 94117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGT, Christopher, A. 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | 02 /
SANTI, Daniel, V. 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607 / US | 03 /
BAYER, Travis, S. 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08857534.5 | 26.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008US85019 | Priority number, date | US20070991678P | 30.11.2007 Original published format: US 991678 P | US20080038368P | 20.03.2008 Original published format: US 38368 P | US20080041467P | 01.04.2008 Original published format: US 41467 P | US20080098221P | 18.09.2008 Original published format: US 98221 P | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009073560 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222833 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/00, C12Q1/48, C12N9/10, C12P5/00 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/10 (EP,US);
C12P5/00 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | C12N1/00, C12Q1/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | GROSSTECHNISCHE HERSTELLUNG ORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG METHYLHALOGENID-TRANSFERASE EXPRIMIERENDER REKOMBINANTER ORGANISMEN | [2010/35] | English: | INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTION OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS USING RECOMBINANT ORGANISMS EXPRESSING METHYL HALIDE TRANSFERASE | [2010/35] | French: | PRODUCTION INDUSTRIELLE DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES À L'AIDE D'ORGANISMES RECOMBINANTS EXPRIMANT UN HALOGÉNURE TRANSFÉRASE DE MÉTHYLE | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 07.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - BAYER TRAVIS S ET AL, "Synthesis of Methyl Halides from Biomass Using Engineered Microbes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (200905), vol. 131, no. 18, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6508 - 6515, XP002631164 [XP] 1-17 * abstract * * page 6509, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 6511, column r, paragraph 2 - page 6515, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA809461U | [Y] - NI XINHAI ET AL, "Expression of Batis maritima methyl chloride transferase in Escherichia coli", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19990330), vol. 96, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3611 - 3615, XP002631165 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * page 3611, column l, paragraph 2 - page 3612, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 3612, column l, paragraph 5 - column r * * page 3615, column l, paragraph 5 - column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.7.3611 | [Y] - SAXENA DEEPTI ET AL, "Biochemical characterization of chloromethane emission from the wood-rotting fungus Phellinus pomaceus", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199808), vol. 64, no. 8, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2831 - 2835, XP002631166 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * page 2832, column l, paragraph 6 - page 2833, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 2834, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2834, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, line 3 * | [Y] - HARPER D B, "HALOMETHANE FROM HALIDE ION A HIGHLY EFFICIENT FUNGAL CONVERSION OF ENVIRONMENTAL SIGNIFICANCE", NATURE (LONDON), (1985), vol. 315, no. 6014, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 55 - 57, XP002631167 [Y] 1-17 * page 56, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 57, column l, line 9 - column r, line 8 * | [Y] - WUOSMAA A M ET AL, "METHYL CHLORIDE TRANSFERASE A CARBOCATION ROUTE FOR BIOSYNTHESIS OF HALOMETABOLITES", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (1990), vol. 249, no. 4965, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 160 - 162, XP002631168 [Y] 1-17 * page 160, column m, line 24 - page 161, column l * * page 162, column l, lines 2-4 * | [Y] - SUN Y., CAMPBELL S. M., LUNSFORD J. H., LEWIS G. E., PALKE D. AND TAU L. M, "The Catalytic Conversion of Methyl Chloride to Ethylene and Propylene over Phosphorus-Modified Mg-ZSM-5 Zeolites", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (20020426), vol. 143, doi:10.1006/jcat.1993.1251, pages 32 - 44, XP002631250 [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * page 32 - page 44 * | International search | [X]US2005267023 (SINCLAIR DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US2007118916 (PUZIO PIOTR [DE], et al); | [Y]US2004175805 (LEONHARTSBERGER SUSANNE [DE], et al); | [Y]US2007026505 (MADDEN KEVIN T [US], et al); | [Y]US5514586 (HOTTINGER HERBERT [CH], et al) | [Y] - NI ET AL., "cDNA cloning of Bats maritima methyl chloride transferase and purification of the enzyme.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 12866 - 12871, XP008127603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.22.12866 | [Y] - MAROBBIO ET AL., "Identifcation and functional reconstitution of yeast mitochondrial carrier for S- adenosylmethionine.", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 5975 - 5982, XP008127604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/cdg574 |