EP2231627 - NEW PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF MOGUISTEINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.M.S.A. ANONIMA MATERIE SINTETICHE E AFFINI S.p.A. Via A. Algardi 4 20148 Milano / IT | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGANO', Enrico Via Sant'Andrea 8 I-22040 Lurago D'erba / IT | 02 /
ARRIGHI, Massimiliano Via Michelangelo 6 I-22070 Luisago / IT | 03 /
MOLTENI, Renato Via Maestri Comacini 20 I-22044 Inverigo / IT | 04 /
LANFRANCONI, Simona Via Bellini 9 I-22070 Montano Lucino / IT | 05 /
LANDONIO, Ernesto Via Pasubio 37 I-20027 Rescaldina / IT | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08857548.5 | 02.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP66591 | Priority number, date | EP20070425770 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07425770 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009071528 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2231627 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231627 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/04, C07D317/22 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
C07D277/04 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
C07D317/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | 02.07.2010 | BA | 02.07.2010 | MK | 02.07.2010 | RS | 02.07.2010 | Title | German: | NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON MOGUISTEIN | [2010/39] | English: | NEW PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF MOGUISTEINE | [2010/39] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DE MOGUISTÉINE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 15.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | FI | 01.06.2011 | HR | 01.06.2011 | SE | 01.06.2011 | NO | 01.09.2011 | IS | 01.10.2011 | IE | 02.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/19] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
IE | 02.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 01.06.2011 | |
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | NO | 01.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0169581 (BOEHRINGER BIOCHEMIA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-19 * Formula I;;; claims 6,7 *; | [A]EP0333080 (BOEHRINGER BIOCHEMIA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-19 * Formula I;;; example 1; claim 5 *; | [A] - GANDOLFI C A ET AL, "N-ACYL-2-SUBSTITUTED-1,3-THIAZOLIDINES, A NEW CLASS OF NON-NARCOTIC ANTITUSSIVE AGENTS: STUDIES LEADING TO THE DISCOVERY OF ETHYL 2- not (2-METHOXYPHENOXY)METHYL 3/4 -BETA-OXOTHIAZOLIDINE-3-PROPANOATE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (19950101), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 508 - 525, XP002909416 [A] 1-19 * Table 2, compound 7; schemes 1,2,7,9; page 512, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00003a014 |