EP2215098 - FLUOROALKYL SILANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERZOG, Axel, Hans-joachim 703 Owen Road West Chester Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Gerald, Oronde 1323 Prospect Drive Wilmington Delaware 19809 / US | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08857672.3 | 01.12.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008US85109 | Priority number, date | US20070005444 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: US 5444 | US20080323593 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: US 323593 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009073595 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215098 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215098 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C07F7/18 (KR);
C07F7/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | FLUORALKYLSILANE | [2010/32] | English: | FLUOROALKYL SILANES | [2010/32] | French: | FLUOROALKYL-SILANES | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 23.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2008 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IE | 01.12.2014 | LU | 01.12.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.12.2008 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 01.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 01.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [PX]US2008113573 (ACOSTA ERICK JOSE [US], et al) [PX] 1,2 * example 13 *; | [X]WO03014131 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * example - *; | [X]JP2000063797 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2009008380 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1,2 * page 17 *; | [A]EP0953331 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3 * | by applicant | EP0157218 | JP2002053805 | EP0950662 | EP0640611 | US2006147645 | US2005136264 | EP0864622 | WO03014131 | JP2000063797 | EP0953331 | US5616762 | GB1298291 | US2007066762 | US3916009 | US20080152312 |