EP2225203 - DEHYDROHALOGENATION PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN PROVIDING 6,6-DIMETHYL-3-AZABICYCLO-[3.1.0]-HEXANE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWOK, Daw-long 33 Land Street Gillette New Jersey 07933 / US | 02 /
LEE, Hong-Chang 56 Lee Road Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | 03 /
ZAVIALOV, Ilia, A. 48 Lockwood Drive Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2010/36] | van den Broek, Ludovicus A.G.M., et al P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 08858215.0 | 20.11.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008US84174 | Priority number, date | US20070004601 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: US 4601 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009073380 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225203 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/52 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C07D209/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Extension states | AL | 28.06.2010 | BA | 28.06.2010 | MK | 28.06.2010 | RS | 28.06.2010 | Title | German: | DEHYDROHALOGENIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FÜR DIE BEREITSTELLUNG VON 6,6-DIMETHYL-3-AZABICYCLO[3.1.0]HEXANVERBINDUNGEN NÜTZLICHEN ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN | [2010/36] | English: | DEHYDROHALOGENATION PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF INTERMEDIATES USEFUL IN PROVIDING 6,6-DIMETHYL-3-AZABICYCLO-[3.1.0]-HEXANE COMPOUNDS | [2010/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSHYDROHALOGÉNATION POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'INTERMÉDIAIRES UTILES POUR FOURNIR DES COMPOSÉS DE 6,6-DIMÉTHYL-3-AZABICYCLO[3.1.0]HEXANE | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYAX]EP0010799 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DY] 1-8 * pages 4-6 * [A] 3-5 [X] 1,2; | [YX]WO2007075790 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * pages 29,31 * [X] 6-8; | [PX]WO2008082508 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * pages 7,8,10 * |