EP2232556 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF PARALLEL INTERCONNECTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Solar, Inc 28101 Cedar Park Boulevard Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Roger, Thomas 19 Chesnut Ridge Court St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | 02 /
CHRISTIANSEN, John, Kenneth 10360 Avenue Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 03 /
POWELL, Ricky, C. 4497 Boulder Pond Drive Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US | 04 /
ROSS, Michael, David 14789 Prairie Lake Drive Perrysburg OH 43551 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08858860.3 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US86163 | Priority number, date | US20070013418P | 13.12.2007 Original published format: US 13418 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009076403 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232556 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/142, H01L31/20 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H01L31/02008 (EP,US);
H01L31/0475 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLELSCHALTUNG VON FOTOVOLTAIKMODULEN | [2010/39] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF PARALLEL INTERCONNECTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES | [2010/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTERCONNEXION EN PARALLÈLE DE MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5593901 (OSWALD ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US7095050 (WANLASS MARK W [US], et al); | [A]US5268037 (GLATFELTER TROY [US]) |