EP2229437 - Engineering zymogen for conditional toxicity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/38] | ENGINEERING ZYMOGEN FOR CONDITIONAL TOXICITY | ||
[2012/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG 3054 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2010/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUCOVIC, Milan 3054 Cornwallis Road Durham North Carolina 27709 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jeng, S. 3054 Cornwallis Road Durham North Carolina 27709 / US | 03 /
WALTERS, Frederick, S. 3054 Cornwallis Road Durham North Carolina 27709 / US | 04 /
PALEKAR, Narenda, V. 3054 Cornwallis Road Durham North Carolina 27709 / US | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Schaberg, Ulf Günther, et al Syngenta International AG Intellectual Property WRO-1004-6-22 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2012/41] |
Former [2010/38] | Schaberg, Ulf Günther, et al Syngenta Participations AG Seeds IP Basel Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 08859771.1 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/38] | WO2008US86205 | Priority number, date | US20070012864P | 11.12.2007 Original published format: US 12864 P | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009076426 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2229437 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/82, C07K19/00, A01N37/46, A01N63/02 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
C07K2319/55 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/38] | C12N9/10, C07K19/00, C12N1/19, A01H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | Manipulation von Zymogen für bedingte Toxizität | [2012/46] | English: | Engineering zymogen for conditional toxicity | [2012/46] | French: | Modification génétique de zymogène pour la toxicité conditionnelle | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/38] | MANIPULATION VON ZYMOGEN FÜR BEDINGTE TOXIZITÄT | ||
Former [2010/38] | ENGINEERING ZYMOGEN FOR CONDITIONAL TOXICITY | ||
Former [2010/38] | MODIFICATION GÉNÉTIQUE DE ZYMOGÈNE POUR LA TOXICITÉ CONDITIONNELLE | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9929721 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [X] 1,17,18,23,38-44 * abstract *; | [X] - VOCERO-AKBANI A M ET AL, "Killing HIV-infected cells by transduction with an HIV protease-activated caspase-3 protein", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 29 - 33, XP002228967 [X] 1,17,18,23,38-44 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/4710 | [DA] - LAZURE CLAUDE, "The peptidase zymogen proregions: Nature's way of preventing undesired activation and proteolysis", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (2002), vol. 8, no. 7, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 511 - 531, XP002516917 [DA] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1381612023395691 | [A] - BARTH HOLGER ET AL, "The uptake machinery of clostridial actin ADP-ribosylating toxins: A cell delivery system for fusion proteins and polypeptide drugs.", NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCHIVES OF PHARMACOLOGY, (200212), vol. 366, no. 6, ISSN 0028-1298, pages 501 - 512, XP002516918 [A] 1-44 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00210-002-0626-Y | [PX] - JUCOVIC MILAN ET AL, "From enzyme to zymogen: engineering Vip2, an ADP-ribosyltransferase from Bacillus cereus, for conditional toxicity", PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN & SELECTION, (200810), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 1741-0126, pages 631 - 638, XP002516919 [PX] 1-44 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/gzn038 | [A] - YONGXIA SHI ET AL, "'Cloning of vip1/vip2 genes and expression of Vip1Ca/Vip2Ac proteins in Bacillus thuringiensis", WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060912), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 1573-0972, pages 501 - 507, XP019485239 [A] 1-44 * abstract * | Examination | - WERNICK NAOMI L B ET AL, "N-terminal Extension of the Cholera Toxin A1-chain Causes Rapid Degradation after Retrotranslocation from Endoplasmic Reticulum to Cytosol", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (201002), vol. 285, no. 9, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6145 - 6152 |