Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010241318 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 | WO2008EP64379 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2222511 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2014 | B1 | EP2222511 | 01.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 | WO2008EP64379 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101896377 | 24.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 | WO2008EP64379 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104859572B | 01.05.2018 | B | CN104859572 | 26.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 | CN200880120059 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009074394 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007059898 | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007059898 | 12.12.2007 |