EP2232162 - BUILDING COMPRISING A WALL OR ROOF WITH AT LEAST ONE HEAT CONTROLLING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/39] | WALL OR ROOF OF A BUILDING WITH AT LEAST ONE HEAT CONTROLLING ELEMENT | ||
[2012/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bourne, Stephen Glyn 1st Floor 11L Hing Keng Shek Sai Kung Kowloon / HK | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08860634.8 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP10467 | Priority number, date | EP20070023874 | 10.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07023874 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009074298 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2232162 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232162 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/00, F24J2/04, F24J2/40, F24J2/34 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
F24S20/66 (EP,US);
F24S20/61 (EP,US);
F24S20/67 (EP,US);
F24S50/80 (EP,US);
F24S60/00 (EP,US);
F24S60/10 (EP,US);
F28F2013/008 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | F24J2/00, F24J2/04, F24J2/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | GEBÄUDE MIT WAND ODER DACH UND MIT MINDESTENS EINEM WÄRMESTEUERELEMENT | [2012/50] | English: | BUILDING COMPRISING A WALL OR ROOF WITH AT LEAST ONE HEAT CONTROLLING ELEMENT | [2012/50] | French: | BÂTIMENT AVEC MUR OU TOIT COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONTRÔLE DE LA CHALEUR | [2012/50] |
Former [2010/39] | WAND ODER DACH EINES GEBÄUDES MIT MINDESTENS EINEM WÄRMESTEUERELEMENT | ||
Former [2010/39] | WALL OR ROOF OF A BUILDING WITH AT LEAST ONE HEAT CONTROLLING ELEMENT | ||
Former [2010/39] | MUR OU TOIT D'UN BÂTIMENT COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONTRÔLE DE LA CHALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 28.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2008 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | HR | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | NO | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | IE | 10.12.2013 | LU | 10.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.12.2008 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2524128 (PEIFFER FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,19-25,27 * page 3, line 17 - page 7, line 16; figure - * [Y] 4,11-13,16; | [Y]WO8700569 (INTEGRALE ENERGIE UMWELTTECH [CH]) [Y] 4,11,12 * page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2492436 (BUCHERE JEANNE MARIE DE [FR]) [Y] 13,16 * page 4, line 11 - line 35; figure - *; | [X]US4324226 (BECK JAMES A) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,19,20,22-25,27 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 49; figure - *; | [A]FR2653528 (CLANCHET FRANCOIS) [A] 1 * page 10, line 34 - page 12, line 2; figure - *; | [A]US4739748 (STICE JAMES D [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 47 - line 54; claim - *; | [A]CH641231 (MUETZENBERG ARNOLD B [CH]) [A] 1,25-27 * page 3, column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US4382437 (WOODS JR JAMES E, et al) [A] 1,25-27 * column 4, line 6 - line 42; figures 7,8 * |