EP2232831 - TELEPHONE KEYPAD BASED ON TRIPODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eatoni Ergonomics, Inc. P.O. Box 27261 Brooklyn, NY 11202 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTOWITZ, Howard, Andrew PO Box 27261 Brooklyn, NY 11202 / US | 02 /
GRIFFIN, Jason, T. 14 Deer Ridge Crescent Kitchner, Ontario N2P 2L3 / CA | 03 /
KECHAGIAS, Dimitrios 427 80th Street 2nd Fl. Brooklyn, NY 11209 / US | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
GUTOWITZ, Howard, Andrew 145 West 67th Street No. 48E New York, NY 10023 / US | ||
02 /
GRIFFIN, Jason, T. 14 Deer Ridge Crescent Kitchner, Ontario N2P 2L3 / CA | |||
03 /
KECHAGIAS, Dimitrios 427 80th Street 2nd Fl. Brooklyn, NY 11209 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08860733.8 | 11.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US86428 | Priority number, date | US20070013253P | 12.12.2007 Original published format: US 13253 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009076527 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232831 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/23, // H04M1/22, H04M1/02 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H04M1/23 (EP,US);
G06F3/0237 (EP,US);
H04M1/0218 (EP,US);
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
H04M1/233 (EP,US);
H04M1/72466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | H04M1/23 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | TASTENFELD FÜR FERNSPRECHGERÄT BASIEREND AUF "TRIPODS" | [2010/39] | English: | TELEPHONE KEYPAD BASED ON TRIPODS | [2010/39] | French: | CLAVIER DE TÉLÉPHONE BASÉ SUR DES TRÉPIEDS | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03063005 (KIM YUH-IL [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP1619861 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 3* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5852414 (YU SEYMOUR H [US], et al); | [X]KR200269601Y (KIM YUH IL [KR]); | [X]KR200276555Y (HWANG SUNG YONG [KR]); | [X]KR200340166Y (NEXTIP CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]KR20060123099 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |