EP2231856 - IN VIVO UNNATURAL AMINO ACID EXPRESSION IN THE METHYLOTROPHIC YEAST PICHIA PASTORIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Travis 859 Loring Street San Diego CA 92109 / US | 02 /
SCHULTZ, Peter, G. 1650 La Jolla Rancho Road La Jolla CA 92037 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Casley, Christopher Stuart, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08860799.9 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US13568 | Priority number, date | US20070007341P | 11.12.2007 Original published format: US 7341 P | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/39] | US20070007341 | 11.12.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009075847 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2231856 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/19, C12N15/81, C12P21/02 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/00 (KR);
C12N1/00 (KR);
C12N15/52 (KR);
C12N9/93 (EP,CN,US);
C12P21/00 (KR);
C12P21/02 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/55 (EP,CN,US);
C12R2001/84 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | C12N1/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | IN-VIVO-EXPRESSION NICHT NATÜRLICHER AMINOSÄUREN IN DER METHYLOTROPHEN HEFE PICHIA PASTORIS | [2010/39] | English: | IN VIVO UNNATURAL AMINO ACID EXPRESSION IN THE METHYLOTROPHIC YEAST PICHIA PASTORIS | [2010/39] | French: | EXPRESSION D'ACIDES AMINÉS NON NATURELS<I>IN VIVO</I>DANS LA LEVURE MÉTHYLOTROPHE PICHIA PASTORIS | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 07.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 02.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2019 | 10.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/08] | 14.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP14194373.8 / EP2889370 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004094593 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1,10 *; | [X]WO2006068802 (AMBRX INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40] , [ 100] , [ 102] - [0104] - [ 106] , [ 107] , [ 124] , [ 130] , [ 151] * * claims 1,31 *; | [XP] - YOUNG TRAVIS S ET AL, "Expanding the Genetic Repertoire of the Methylotrophic Yeast Pichia pastoris", BIOCHEMISTRY, (200903), vol. 48, no. 12, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 2643 - 2653, XP002631536 [XP] 1-13 * page 2643 - page 2653 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BI802178K | [Y] - CHEN ET AL, "An Improved System for the Generation and Analysis of Mutant Proteins Containing Unnatural Amino Acids in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20070709), vol. 371, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2007.05.017, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 112 - 122, XP022145895 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 119, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2007.05.017 | International search | [A]US2003082575 (SCHULTZ PETER [US], et al); | [A]US2005009049 (CHIN JASON W [GB], et al); | [A] - XIE, J. ET AL., "Adding amino acids to the genetic repertoire", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 9, pages 548 - 554, XP025370026 | [A] - CEREGHINO, J.L. ET AL., "'Heterologous protein expression in the methylotrophic yeast Pichia pastoris'. FEMS Microbiology Reviews", (2000), vol. 24, pages 45 - 66, XP002195512 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-6445(99)00029-7 | Examination | - CRANE D I ET AL, "The Pichia pastoris HIS4 gene: nucleotide sequence, creation of a non-reverting his4 deletion mutant, and development of HIS4-based replicating and integrating plasmid", CURRENT GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940101), vol. 26, doi:10.1007/BF00309932, ISSN 0172-8083, pages 443 - 450, XP002116157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00309932 | - DAVID RESINA ET AL, "Developing high cell density fed-batch cultivation strategies for heterologous protein production in Pichia pastoris using the nitrogen source-regulated FLD1 promoter", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, vol. 91, no. 6, doi:10.1002/BIT.20545, ISSN 0006-3592, (20050901), pages 760 - 767, (20050525), XP002506158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20545 | by applicant | WO2004094593 | WO2006068802 | - CHEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 371, no. 1, pages 112 - 122 | - CRANE; GOULD, CURR. GENET., (1994), vol. 26, pages 443 - 450 | - RESINA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 91, no. 6, pages 760 - 767 | - "PCR Cloning Protocols", Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, vol. 192 | - LICKLIDER, L.J.; THOREEN, C.C.; PENG, J.; GYGI, S.P., "Automation of nanoscale microcapillary liquid chromatography-tandem mass spectrometry with a vented column", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 74, pages 3076 - 3083 | - BURNETTE, W.N., "Western blotting'': electrophoretic transfer of proteins from sodium dodecyl sulfate--polyacrylamide gels to unmodified nitrocellulose and radiographic detection with antibody and radioiodinated protein A.", ANAL BIOCHEM, (1981), vol. 112, pages 195 - 203 | - ROEPSTORFF, P.; FOHLMAN, J., "Proposal for a common nomenclature for sequence ions in mass spectra of peptides", BIOMED MASS SPECTROM, (1984), vol. 11, page 601 |