EP2232830 - DEVICE FEATURE MANIPULATION BASED ON PRESENTED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAM NIELSEN, Peter Holmelins Tvaervej 9 DK-2800 Kgs Lyngby / DK | 02 /
KRAFT, Christian Rossing Carit Etlarsvej 22, 3.TV DK-1814 Frederiksberg / DK | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08861873.1 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008IB03509 | Priority number, date | US20070957966 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: US 957966 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077847 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232830 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/22, H04M1/73, G09G3/34, G06F1/32 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
G06F1/3218 (EP,US);
G09G3/3406 (EP,US);
H04W52/027 (EP,US);
G09G2320/062 (EP,US);
G09G2320/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | MANIPULATION EINER GERÄTEFUNKTION AUF DER BASIS VON PRÄSENTIERTEN INHALTEN | [2010/39] | English: | DEVICE FEATURE MANIPULATION BASED ON PRESENTED CONTENT | [2010/39] | French: | MANIPULATION DE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF EN FONCTION D'UN CONTENU PRÉSENTÉ | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/07] | Request for further processing for: | 14.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0907158 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14,16-21,23 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0118] * * figures 1,3,9,10 * [Y] 4,10,15,22; | [Y]US2004109030 (FARRINGTON SHANNON MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 4,10,15,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] * * figure 3 *; | [X]WO2005024765 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14,16-21,23 * page 1, line 5 - line 14 * * page 2, line 3 - line 23 * * page 3, line 10 - line 13 * * page 6, line 23 - line 27 * * page 7, line 4 - line 10 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 4 * * page 11, line 20 - line 24 * * page 12, line 18 - line 21 * * page 13, line 3 - page 14, line 9 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 13 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2006190831 (KELSO SCOTT E [US], et al) [A] 4,10,15,22 * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * |