EP2235199 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAINTENANCE OF FLUID CONDUCTING AND CONTAINMENT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lux Innovate Limited Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUSSAVI, Artin LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 02 /
ROWLEY-WILLAMS, Catherine LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 03 /
MACKENZIE, Cameron LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 04 /
MACKAY, Fiona LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 05 /
FULLER, Anne-Marie LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 06 /
MAGDALENIC, Vjera LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | 07 /
PERFECT, Emma LUX Innovate Ltd. Unit 5.3 21 Research Avenue South Heriot Watt Research Park Edinburgh EH14 4AP / GB | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08862025.7 | 17.12.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008GB04177 | Priority number, date | GB20070024541 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: GB 0724541 | GB20080018358 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0818358 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077760 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2235199 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N21/77 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
C08F2/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR WARTUNG VON FLUIDLEIT- UND -HALTESYSTEMEN | [2010/40] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MAINTENANCE OF FLUID CONDUCTING AND CONTAINMENT SYSTEMS | [2010/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE SYSTÈMES D'ACHEMINEMENT ET DE CONFINEMENT DE FLUIDES | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 30.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004200756 (HAYNAL ROBERT J [US]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2006127360 (SDG INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * claim 10 * | by applicant | US4188478 | US4518753 | WO8703603 | US5015692 | US5128419 | US5128416 | US5171450 | US5393843 | US5405911 | WO9621683 | WO9633223 | US5621995 | EP0785422 | WO9854569 | WO9931104 | US6040406 | US6071434 | US6218491 | WO0144403 | US6251680 | WO0181654 | US6312644 | WO2005000747 | WO2005001241 | US6849735 | WO2005077987 | WO2005080989 | WO2005085297 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, pages 2596 - 2599 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, page 5395 | - CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), page 2379 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2007), vol. 129, pages 15156 - 15163 | - H. C. KOLB; M. G. FINN; K. B. SHARPLESS, ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2001), vol. 40, page 2004 | - LANGMUIR, (2007), vol. 23, pages 8452 - 8459 | - BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2006), vol. 7, page 2297 | - J. MATER. CHEM., (2007), vol. 17, page 4015 | - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, page 7258 | - MACROMOL.RAPID.COMMUN., (2008), vol. 29, pages 511 - 519 | - J. POLYMER SCI: PART A, (2007), vol. 45, pages 4225 - 4239 | - J. APP. POLYMER SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 91, page 2035 | - NAKAMURA M.; MIEM.; FUNABASHIH.; KOBATAKE E., "Construction of streptavidin-luciferase fusion protein for ATP sensing with fixed form", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2004), vol. 26, no. 13, pages 1061 - 1066 | - LAITINEN O. H.; MARTTILA A. T.; AIRENNE K. J.; KULIK T.; LIVNAH 0.; BAYER E. A.; WILCHEK M.; KULOMAA M. S., "Biotin induces tetramerization of a recombinant monomeric avidin. A model for protein-protein interactions", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 16;276, no. 11, pages 8219 - 24 |