EP2222486 - DEVICE FOR PREVENTING SLIPPING OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Il Jun 106-703 Daelim Apt. 415-1 Susaek-dong Eunpyeong-gu, Seoul 122-872 / KR | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Plaçais, Jean Yves Cabinet Netter, 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08862422.6 | 15.12.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008KR07415 | Priority number, date | KR20070132401 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070132401 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009078643 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2222486 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/20, B60C27/22 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
B60C27/22 (EP,KR,US);
A44B11/06 (KR);
B60C27/065 (KR);
B60C27/10 (KR);
Y10T152/10207 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | B60C27/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | ANTIRUTSCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2010/35] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREVENTING SLIPPING OF VEHICLE | [2010/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EMPÊCHER LE PATINAGE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006049403 (PARK IL JUN [KR]) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]KR200424423Y (PARK) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [AP]WO2008150138 (APEX TECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-3* figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]KR200221687Y (SONG, DEOK SU); | [A]KR200289488Y (KIM, SUN HEE); | [A]KR200424423Y (PARK, IL JUN); | [A]KR100794048B (PARK IL JUN [KR]) |