EP2241613 - FLUID RECEIVING CARTRIDGE AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURASATO, Masahiro c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Kazunari c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Dai c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
ORIBE, Akinobu c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 05 /
NIWA, Kousuke c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane GB-London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08862757.5 | 12.12.2008 | [2010/42] | WO2008JP72638 | Priority number, date | JP20070323915 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007323915 | JP20070323914 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007323914 | JP20080061051 | 11.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008061051 | JP20080172659 | 01.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008172659 | [2010/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009078352 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2241613 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, B01J19/00, C12Q1/68 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01F33/403 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01L2200/04 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0803 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsauffangpatrone und Verwendung davon | [2010/42] | English: | FLUID RECEIVING CARTRIDGE AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME | [2010/42] | French: | CARTOUCHE RÉCEPTRICE DE FLUIDE ET SON UTILISATION | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2010 | Translation filed | 24.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5731212 (GAVIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0072970 (CEPHEID [US]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0958862 (AMS S R L [IT]) [X] 1,2,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004119070 (ROACH DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03023410 (INNOVADYNE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 23, line 23 - page 30, line 20; figures 10-20 *; | [A]WO2004000463 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006009750 (NAGACO & CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2005064339 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004504828 (GENESYSTEM); | [Y]WO2005093388 (INFECTIO RECHERCHE INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2006136990 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO9320441 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [A]JP2006308428 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) | by applicant | JP2005313065 |