EP2231421 - RUBBER COMPOSITION IN PARTICULAR FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF TYRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 12 cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Aurélie 90 bis avenue de Royat F-63400 Chamalieres / FR | 02 /
RIOU, Aline 2 bis impasse Chamberet F-63118 Cebazat / FR | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Sylvia Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Cohen, Sylvia M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, place des Carmes Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08863146.0 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP67665 | Priority number, date | FR20070059916 | 18.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0759916 | [2010/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077541 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231421 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L21/00, C08L23/22, C08L23/26, C08K3/04 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B60C9/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0008 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08K5/0016 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REIFEN | [2010/39] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION IN PARTICULAR FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF TYRES | [2010/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC NOTAMMENT POUR LA FABRICATION DE PNEUMATIQUE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] | Request for further processing for: | 03.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 03.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0711642 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-35 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 7 * * example 1; table 1 *; | [Y]US6372855 (CHINO KEISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-35 * column 1, lines 54-60 * * column 2, lines 15-21 * * column 3, lines 4-12 * * column 7, lines 49-65 * * column 8, lines 56-67 ** examples III-4; tables III-1 * |