EP2186226 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS USING MULTI-BAND RADIO FREQUENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/34] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Seung Hee LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Ki Ho LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
NOH, Min Seok LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
KWAK, Jin Sam LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 05 /
KWON, Yeong Hyeon LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Hyun Woo LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Dong Cheol LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 08 /
MOON, Sung Ho LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 09 /
CHO, Sung Gu LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 10 /
LEE, Moon Il LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2017/34] |
Former [2010/20] | 01 /
HAN, Seung Hee LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | ||
02 /
NAM, Ki Ho LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
03 /
NOH, Min Seok LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
04 /
KWAK, Jin Sam LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
05 /
KWON, Yeong Hyeon LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Hyun Woo LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Dong Cheol LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
08 /
MOON, Sung Ho LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
09 /
CHO, Sung Gu LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | |||
10 /
LEE, Moon Il LG Institute Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2017/34] |
Former [2010/20] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08863526.3 | 23.12.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008KR07620 | Priority number, date | US20070016496P | 24.12.2007 Original published format: US 16496 P | KR20080029099 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080029099 | KR20080075602 | 01.08.2008 Original published format: KR 20080075602 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009082160 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186226 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186226 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L5/00, H04B7/12, H04L1/04 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H04L5/0058 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/04 (KR);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN MITTELS MEHRBANDFUNKFREQUENZEN | [2010/20] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS USING MULTI-BAND RADIO FREQUENCIES | [2010/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX UTILISANT DES FRÉQUENCES RADIO MULTIBANDES | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 29.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2008 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | GB | 23.12.2017 | IE | 23.12.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | LU | 23.12.2017 | MT | 23.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 23.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 23.12.2017 | ||
MT | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007015962 (T MOBILE USA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 6-13 * * page 9, line 12 - page 12, line 4 * * page 12, line 6 - page 15, line 24 *; | [X] - TONELLO A M ET AL, "An asynchronous multitone multiuser air interface for high-speed uplink communications", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-FALL. 2003 IEEE 58TH ORLANDO, FL, USA 6-9 OCT. 2003; [IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE], PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20031006), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285933, ISBN 978-0-7803-7954-1, pages 2267 - 2271, XP010702638 [X] 1-4 * figure 3 * * section IV-A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2003.1285933 | International search | [A]WO2006104344 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]US2004052273 (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2004028057 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) |