EP2229724 - SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUIT AND METHOD WITH FREQUENCY UP- AND DOWN-CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states ST-Ericsson SA 39 Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DE BEEK, Remco Dufaystraat 21 NL-5654 DV Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LEENAERTS, Domine Eikestraat 6 NL-5561 TE Riethoven / NL | 03 /
RAZZELL, Charles 1805 Brooktree Way Pleasanton CA 94566 / US | 04 /
BERGERVOET, Jozef R. M. Willem Klooslaan 77 NL-5615 NM Eindhoven / NL | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 08863635.2 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/38] | WO2008EP68079 | Priority number, date | EP20070123938 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07123938 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009080776 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2229724 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2229724 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/00, H04L27/36, H04L27/38 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
H03D7/00 (EP,US);
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04L27/227 (EP,US);
H04L27/364 (EP,US);
H03D2200/0047 (EP,US);
H03D2200/0082 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0016 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0022 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN MIT AUF- UND ABWÄRTSFREQUENZUMWANDLUNG | [2010/38] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING CIRCUIT AND METHOD WITH FREQUENCY UP- AND DOWN-CONVERSION | [2010/38] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX À ÉLÉVATION ET ABAISSEMENT DE FRÉQUENCE | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HR | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | PL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | NO | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | IE | 19.12.2011 | LU | 19.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006034356 (FECHTEL STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1,2A,2C *; | [A]US2006109893 (CHEN HSIN-HUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5B *; | [DA] - CHIA-HUNG HSU ET AL, "FPGA Prototype for WLAN OFDM Baseband with STPE of I/Q Mismatch Self Calibration Algorithm", ASIAN SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2005, IEEE, PI, (20051101), ISBN 978-0-7803-9162-8, pages 509 - 512, XP031019856 [DA] 1,9 * figure 2 * |