EP2232270 - METHOD FOR ASSESSING RISK OF HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMaster University McMaster Industry Liaison Office MIP Suite 100 175 Longwood Road South Hamilton, Ontario L8S 1A1 / CA | [2013/07] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states McMaster University McMaster Industry Liaison Office MIP Suite 100 175 Longwood Road South Hamilton, Ontario L8S 1A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAVSAK, Peter 2915 Westoak Trails Road Oakville, Ontario L6M 4V2 / CA | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John, et al Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Teuten, Andrew John, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2013/07] | Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Taylor House 39 High Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08863936.4 | 18.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008CA02236 | Priority number, date | US20070008594P | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 8594 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009079773 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232270 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232270 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/58, C12Q1/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N33/6869 (EP,US);
G01N2333/475 (EP,US);
G01N2333/485 (EP,US);
G01N2333/523 (EP,US);
G01N2333/5412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER GEFAHR EINES HERZVERSAGENS | [2010/39] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSESSING RISK OF HEART FAILURE | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVALUER UN RISQUE D'ARRÊT CARDIAQUE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 23.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2012 | 19.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2008 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - TIAN Y ET AL, "The variation of serum cytokines in stress and coronary heart diseases", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY; 58TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-OF-CLINICAL-CHEMISTRY;CHICAGO, IL, USA; JULY 23 20060601 AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20060601), vol. 52, no. 6 supplement S, ISSN 0009-9147, page A139, XP008130550 [X] 8-13 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 | [XA] - GUO G H ET AL, "To detect serum cytokines by using biochip technology", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY; ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-FOR-CL INICAL-CHEMISTRY; ORLANDO, FL, USA; JULY 24 -28, 2005, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20050101), vol. 51, no. supplement 6, ISSN 0009-9147, page A119, XP008130551 [X] 8-13 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 | [X] - FITZGERALD S PETE ET AL, "Simultaneous analysis of circulating human cytokines using a high-sensitivity cytokine biochip array.", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH JAN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18020322, (20071117), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 450 - 455, XP002614263 [X] 8-13 * the whole document * * In particular: Abstract; p.50, col. 2, paragraph 2; Materials and methods section. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/PR070409O | International search | [A] - KAVSAK ET AL., "Risk stratification for heart failure and death in an acute coronary syndrome population using inflammatory cytokines and N-terminal pro-brain natriuretic peptide", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 53, no. 12, pages 2112 - 2118 | [A] - KAVSAK ET AL., "Upstream markers'' provide for an early identification of patients at high risk for myocardial necrosis and adverse outcomes''", CLIN. CHEM. ACTA, (200801), vol. 387, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cca.2007.09.023, pages 133 - 138, XP022332368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2007.09.023 | [A] - BIMER ET AL., HEAD-TO-HEAD COMPARISON OF BNP AND IL-6 AS MARKERS OF CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL HEART FAILURE: SUPERIORITY OF BNP, (200711), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 89 - 97 | Examination | US2006094056 | by applicant | - KAVSAK ET AL., CLIN CHEM., (2007), vol. 53, pages 2112 - 2118 | - KAVSAK ET AL., CLIN CHEM ACTA, (2008), vol. 387, pages 133 - 138 | - TIAN ET AL., CLIN CHEM. 58TH ANNUAL MEETING, (2006), vol. 52, page A139 | - KAVSAK ET AL., CLIN CHEM., (2007), vol. 53, page 2115 |