EP2231464 - CONTAINER-CARRYING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gaussin, Christophe Chemin des Brûlées 36 1093 La Conversion / CH | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain, et al Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Rhein, Alain, et al CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | ||
Former [2010/39] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 08864222.8 | 08.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008FR52243 | Priority number, date | FR20070059762 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0759762 | [2010/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009080970 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2231464 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231464 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/02, B62D21/02, B62D21/20, B60P1/64, B60P7/13 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B62D21/02 (EP);
B60P1/6481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | CONTAINERTRANSPORTFAHRZEUG | [2010/39] | English: | CONTAINER-CARRYING VEHICLE | [2010/39] | French: | VEHICULE PORTE-CONTENEURS | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2008 | AT | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | HR | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | IE | 08.12.2012 | LU | 08.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GB | 17.01.2013 | NO | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
LU | 08.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GB | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GB | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GB | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
IE | 08.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
NO | 17.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6309153 (PETZITILLO JR ANTHONY D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [XA]JP2007118928 (TOKYU CAR CORP) [X] 1,3,5-9,11 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * [A] 2,4; | [XA]AU716147B (RAVEN KEVIN W, et al) [X] 1,3,5-9 * page 16, lines 1-10; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4; | [XA]GB2255054 (SWAN COMMERCIAL SUSPENSIONS LI [GB]) [X] 1,3,8,9 * page 3, lines 9-25; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4 |