EP2222586 - DEVICE FOR UNSTACKING MULTIMODAL POSTAL ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solystic 14, Avenue Raspail 94257 Gentilly Cedex / FR | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBROISE, Stéphane 7 Lot. l'Orée du Rhône 26600 Serves / FR | 02 /
SAMAIN, Stéphane 23 allée des Vignes F-26120 Chabeuil / FR | 03 /
CHORIER-PICHON, Pierre 6 rue des Tuileries F-26100 Romans / FR | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Prugneau, Philippe Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Prugneau, Philippe Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 08864676.5 | 02.12.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008FR52182 | Priority number, date | FR20070060097 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0760097 | [2010/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009080929 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2222586 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2222586 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/02, B65H3/12, B65H3/48, B07C1/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B65H3/124 (EP,US);
B07C1/02 (EP,US);
B65H1/025 (EP,US);
B65H3/48 (EP,US);
B65H2511/214 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10 (EP,US);
B65H2515/20 (EP,US);
B65H2515/60 (EP,US);
B65H2515/70 (EP,US);
B65H2553/24 (EP,US);
B65H2553/41 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/214, B65H2220/02 (EP,US);
B65H2511/414, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP);
B65H2515/20, B65H2220/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTSTAPELUNG MULTIMODALER POSTSENDUNGEN | [2010/35] | English: | DEVICE FOR UNSTACKING MULTIMODAL POSTAL ITEMS | [2010/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉPILAGE D'ENVOIS POSTAUX MULTI-MODES | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | HR | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | IE | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | PL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | NO | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | LU | 02.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
HR | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NO | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
NO | 18.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0087341 (HOTCHKISS BRANDT SOGEME [FR]); | [DA]FR2797856 (MANNESMANN DEMATIC POSTAL AUTOMATION SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6270070 (SALOMON JAMES A [US], et al); | [A]WO2004113207 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP1602606 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |