EP2240033 - METHOD AND APPLIANCE FOR MAKING ICE COFFEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN AKER, Karel, J., A. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BAKKER, Arjan, F. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08864726.8 | 04.12.2008 | [2010/42] | WO2008IB55087 | Priority number, date | EP20070123845 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07123845 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009081299 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240033 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/24, A47J31/24 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
A47J31/36 (EP,US);
A23G9/045 (EP,US);
A47J31/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EISKAFFEE | [2010/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPLIANCE FOR MAKING ICE COFFEE | [2010/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LA PRÉPARATION DE CAFÉ GLACÉ | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 18.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6156616 ; | [A]JPH0387142 ; | [A]US6973869 (LIN HUAN-LIANG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * column 1, lines 9-14 *; | [A]US7231142 (LEUNG CHI WAH [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * * column 2, lines 32-39 *; | [A] - What's the best way to make Iced coffeee?, (20060627), XP002486464 [A] 1-3 * pages 1-4 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 18, Database accession no. 1986-116314, XP002486465 & JPS6156616 A 19860322 (DUCK KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 21, Database accession no. 1991-152397, XP002486466 & JPH0387142 A 19910411 (MK DENSAI YG) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |