EP2193377 - METHOD OF SCREENING FOR COMPOUNDS THAT CAN BE USED FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Universite Paul Cezanne Marseille III 3 avenue Robert Schuman 13628 Aix-en-Provence / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique- CNRS 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
For all designated states Universite Paul Cezanne Marseille III 3 avenue Robert Schuman 13628 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARHANIN, Jacques 27 avenue Mendiguren F-06000 Nice / FR | 02 /
GESTREAU, Christian Résidence La Monette Bâtiment B 169 avenue des Caillols F-13012 Marseille / FR | 03 /
WARTH, Richard Froehliche Tuerkenstr. 14 93047 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
HEITZMANN, Dirk Klosterstrasse 19 48143b Münster / DE | 05 /
THOMAS, Jörg Krankenhausstr. 6 89231 Neu Ulm / DE | [2010/35] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
BARHANIN, Jacques 27 avenue Mendiguren F-06000 Nice / FR | ||
02 /
GESTREAU, Christian Résidence La Monette Bâtiment B 169 avenue des Caillols F-13012 Marseille / FR | |||
03 /
WARTH, Richard Froehliche Tuerkenstr. 14 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
04 /
HEITZMANN, Dirk Neue-Waag-Gasse 1 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
05 /
THOMAS, Jörg Krankenhausstr. 6 89231 Neu Ulm / DE | |||
Former [2010/23] | 01 /
UNIVERSITE PAUL CEZANNE MARSEILLE III 3 avenue Robert Schuman F-13628 Aix-en-Provence / FR | ||
02 /
BARHANIN, Jacques 27 avenue Mendiguren F-06000 Nice / FR | |||
03 /
GESTREAU, Christian Résidence La Monette Bâtiment B 169 avenue des Caillols F-13012 Marseille / FR | |||
04 /
WARTH, Richard Froehliche Tuerkenstr. 14 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
05 /
HEITZMANN, Dirk Neue-Waag-Gasse 1 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
06 /
THOMAS, Jörg Krankenhausstr. 6 89231 Neu Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08865189.8 | 03.10.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008FR01391 | Priority number, date | FR20070006999 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: FR 0706999 | [2010/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009080910 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193377 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12Q1/02 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US);
G01N2800/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | SCREENING-VERFAHREN FÜR VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSLEIDEN | [2010/23] | English: | METHOD OF SCREENING FOR COMPOUNDS THAT CAN BE USED FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY CONDITIONS | [2010/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE DE COMPOSÉS UTILISABLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 27.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005054867 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-17 * * page 56, line 3 - line 5 * * page 56, line 24 - line 35 * * page 39, line 27 * * page 40, line 3 * [I] 6; | [A] - NIEMEYER M I ET AL, "Modulation of the two-pore domain acid-sensitive K+ channel TASK-2 (KCNK5) by changes in cell volume.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20011116), vol. 276, no. 46, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 43166 - 43174, XP009100818 [A] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M107192200 | [A] - GABRIEL ANJA ET AL, "Localization of the tandem pore domain K+ channel KCNK5 (TASK-2) in the rat central nervous system.", BRAIN RESEARCH. MOLECULAR BRAIN RESEARCH, Netherlands (09-12-2001: on-line), (20020131), vol. 98, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0169-328X(01)00330-8, ISSN 0169-328X, pages 153 - 163, XP002329398 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-328X(01)00330-8 |