10.06.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
27.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
12.09.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
23.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
04.10.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
28.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.07.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
05.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
05.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
05.07.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
19.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
03.06.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
25.02.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
30.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
13.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|