Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8747592 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2011036482 | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | WO2008DK50300 | 08.12.2008 | US80976008 | 08.12.2008 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2222454 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B1 | EP2222454 | 01.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | WO2008DK50300 | 08.12.2008 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101903162 | 01.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | WO2008DK50300 | 08.12.2008 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2222454T | 27.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | WO2008DK50300 | 08.12.2008 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2444940T | 27.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | WO2008DK50300 | 08.12.2008 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009080038 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701879 | 21.12.2007 | US870207 | 21.12.2007 |