Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010274401 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80921808 | 22.12.2008 | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2232343 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2017 | B1 | EP2232343 | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0820555 | 16.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101896872B | 28.11.2012 | B | CN101896872 | 24.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2647217T | 20.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010005674 | 05.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 | WO2008DK00448 | 22.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009080036 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200701871 | 20.12.2007 | US1545107 | 20.12.2007 |